TURTON TOWER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Use of Turton Tower for any or all of the following purposes:museum, library, reading room, meeting room or offices for the work of the Trustees, or a public park or recreation grounds, or such other public purposes as the Trustees shall from time to time determine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 23 May 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.32k | £16.25k | £73.26k | £2.57k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.12k | £9.05k | £66.06k | £9.28k | £3.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.12k | £9.05k | £66.06k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 March 2025 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2024 | 349 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 January 2024 | 707 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2024 | 1072 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 1931 AS AFFECTED BY SCHEME DATED 24 SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO USE THE SAID HEREDITAMENTS AND PREMISES FOR ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES, NAMELY:- MUSEUM, LIBRARY, READING ROOM, MEETING ROOM OR OFFICES FOR THE WORK OF THE (TURTON URBAN DISTRICT) COUNCIL OR A PUBLIC PARK OR RECREATION GROUNDS OR SUCH OTHER PUBLIC PARK OR RECREATION GROUNDS OR SUCH OTHER PUBLIC PURPOSES AS THE COUNCIL SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND TO PERMIT THE PUBLIC TO HAVE FREE ACCESS THERETO AT SUCH TIMES AND SUBJECT TO SUCH REGULATIONS AS THE COUNCIL SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blackburn With Darwen Borough Counc
Town Hall
King William Street
BLACKBURN
BB1 7DY
- Phone:
- 01254585585
- Email:
- turtontower@blackburn.gov.uk
- Website:
-
turtontower.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window