Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF KIRKANDREWS UPON ESK CHURCH

Charity number: 1183687
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 November 2024 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 November 2024 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 August 2024 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 August 2024 293 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 November 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 November 2022 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window