SPACE ART
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the advancement of contemporary art, especially where practitioners are from communities under-represented in the field, or who are otherwise disadvantaged, by curating, organising and funding exhibitions (or other modes of projects) of contemporary art or related cultural activities. Further, to make grants to third parties undertaking activities which meet the charity's aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN ROY HILL DAVID | Chair | 25 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Paul Sandom | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Laura House | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £194.13k | £155.57k | £167.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £50.25k | £72.91k | £162.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 July 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 31 July 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 31 August 2022 | 397 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF CONTEMPORARY ART, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) MAINTAINING AN ART GALLERY FOR EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC OF CONTEMPORARY ART OF NEW AND ESTABLISHED CONTEMPORARY ARTISTS OF ARTISTIC OR EDUCATIONAL MERIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITIES OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE UNDERREPRESENTED IN THE CONTEMPORARY ARTS. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF CONTEMPORARY ART THROUGH EXHIBITIONS, PERFORMANCES, PUBLICATIONS, SEMINARS, LECTURES, TALKS OR OTHER SIMILAR EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
373 Kennington Road
Kennington
SE11 4PT
- Phone:
- 02078201120
- Email:
- admin.jodavid@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window