THE DEDDINGTON CHARITY ESTATES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of housing accommodation for beneficiaries. The relief of persons resident in the area of benefit who are in need, hardship or distress. The promotion of education by providing of contributing benefits for local residents or any school serving the area of benefit as agreed from time to time with the Governors in the case of a school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 20 March 2020: CIO registration
- 14 September 2020: Funds received from 237601 DEDDINGTON CHARITY ESTATES
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Henry Nicholas Fielden | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Aimee Leszczenski | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Treadwell | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Overend Hamilton Lambert | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Maureen Bernedette Cox | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Maria Westley | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL LIEBRECHT BA LIM | Trustee | 02 December 2010 |
|
|||||
Helen Margaret Oldfield | Trustee | 05 August 2010 |
|
|
||||
Fern Leonie Stringer | Trustee | 18 March 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.47k | £16.40k | £33.73k | £34.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £37.67k | £43.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 February 2023 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 February 2023 | 116 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Mar 2020 as amended on 28 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
(a) The provision of housing accommodation for beneficiaries; (b) The relief of persons resident in the area of benefit who are in need, hardship or distress. (c) The maintenance and preservation of the CIO’s assets as described in Appendix 1 to this constitution. (d) The promotion of education by providing or contributing to such special benefits of any kind for any local resident or for any school substantially serving the area of benefit, in the case of a school as may from time to time be agreed between the Trustees and the Governors of the school.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE TOWN HALL
MARKET PLACE
DEDDINGTON
OXFORDSHIRE
OX15 0SE
- Phone:
- 01869338790
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window