CORNWALL LIFE RECYCLE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are based in Camborne and rescue and rebuild old bicycles, we work with people of all ages who are disadvantaged by health, learning or a disability to achieve this, each person works on a one to one with a volunteer or member of staff, and they learn new skills that will help them in the future. They also learn to work as a team and make new friends, reducing isolation and building confidence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 September 2023
Total income includes £4,900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 24 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Baines OBE | Chair | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Cornelius | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Oakley | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Hampton | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Garrick | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/09/2020 | 23/09/2021 | 23/09/2022 | 23/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.40k | £69.91k | £90.25k | £120.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.51k | £62.17k | £74.41k | £110.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £9.98k | £40.10k | £4.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 September 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 September 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 September 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 September 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY A) THE PROMOTION OF WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE RECLAMATION, RECYCLING, USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS AND THE USE OF SURPLUS; B) BY THE RECYCLING OF UNWANTED OLD BICYCLES, WHICH PROVIDES TRANSPORT AND HEALTH BENEFITS TO PEOPLE IN CORNWALL. 2.TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE OF ALL AGES FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH HEALTH ISSUES, LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, MENTAL HEALTH, ADDICTIONS AND OTHER DISADVANTAGES. TO WORK TO IMPROVE THE LIVES OF THOSE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED. TO MENTOR AND SUPPORT IN A FRIENDLY SAFE ENVIRONMENT. TO LEARN NEW SKILLS, BUILDING CONFIDENCE AND SELF ESTEEM. SUPPORTING PEOPLE TO MOVE CLOSER TO VOLUNTEERING AND/OR EMPLOYMENT. TO RECYCLE OLD BICYCLES, PROVIDING LOW COST TRANSPORT ALLOWING PEOPLE OF ALL AGES IN CORNWALL TO RIDE FOR FUN AND HEALTH, REDUCING SOCIAL ISOLATION, TO RIDE TO WORK REDUCING TRAFFIC AND POLLUTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Life Recycle
Unit E2
Formal Industrial Estate
Treswithian
CAMBORNE
TR14 0PY
- Phone:
- 01209697170
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window