MAYI BHAGO SEVA TRUST UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty in the UK and worldwide (initially in the Punjab region of India) for the public benefit and in line with the tenets of the Sikh Faith, by collecting regular donations to provide financial assistance, facilities, services and other items to individuals facing financial hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 01 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rupinderjit Kaur | Chair | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Harinder Kaur | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sukhwinder Kaur | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Balbir Kaur Dhesi | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kamaljit Kaur Sandhu | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.60k | £29.79k | £15.78k | £22.22k | £16.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.15k | £19.07k | £24.79k | £20.73k | £20.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 March 2021 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UK AND WORLDWIDE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN LINE WITH THE TENETS OF THE SIKH FAITH, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF PROVIDING: - GRANTS AND OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO INDIVIDUALS - FACILITIES, SERVICES AND OTHER ITEMS
Contact information
- Address:
-
118 PROFFITT AVENUE
COVENTRY
CV6 7ET
- Phone:
- +447986348034
- Email:
- harinder@harkul.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window