MAGNA CARTA WORLD PEACE AND SUSTAINABILITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote National and International conflict resolutions and reconcilliation by identifying the social and economical causes through research. To mediate with parties to the conflict and others to discuss such research and possible solutions. To publish reports for the public benefit on peace related topics. To organise conferences and forums to promote international peace and sustainability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PREM DUTT SHARMA | Chair | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yuanfeng Chen | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Yu Xiong | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robin Alexander Stewart Thomson | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Yinshan Tang | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £3.17k | £12.00k | £2.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £599 | £10.36k | £3.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 April 2022 | 178 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2022 | 362 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH A VIEW TO RELIEVING SUFFERING, POVERTY AND DISTRESS AND BUILDING AND MAINTAINING SOCIAL COHESION AND TRUST WITHIN AND BETWEEN COMMUNITIES BY: A) INVESTIGATING AND IDENTIFYING PROBABLE CAUSES OF THE CONFLICT; B) EXAMINING PROBABLE SOLUTIONS TO THE CONFLICT THROUGH PARTICIPATORY RESEARCH INTO RELEVANT ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL ISSUES; C) MEDIATING WITH PARTIES TO THE CONFLICT AND OTHERS TOGETHER TO DISCUSS SUCH RESEARCH AND POSSIBLE SOLUTIONS ENABLING THEM TO BUILD RELATIONSHIPS OF TRUST; D) RECOMMENDING TO THE INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITY AND THE PARTIES INVOLVED THE MEASURES WHICH, IN THE TRUSTEES’ OPINION, ARE LIKELY TO RESULT IN THE RESOLUTION OR PREVENTION OF THE CONFLICT OR THE REDUCTION OF ANY HUMANITARIAN CRISIS THAT MAY ENSUE FROM THE CONFLICT; E) PUBLISHING REPORTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ON THE CAUSES AND RECOMMENDED SOLUTIONS OF PARTICULAR CONFLICTS; PROVIDED THAT ALL ACTIVITIES SHALL BE BALANCED AND SHALL MAINTAIN OR ENHANCE THE CIO’S COMMITMENT TO REMAINING IMPARTIAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Pitts Lane
Earley
READING
RG6 1BT
- Phone:
- 01183787871
- Email:
- y.tang@henley.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window