Accounts and annual returns HEALTH EMPOWERMENT PROJECT CIO

Charity Number: 1187655
Charity reporting is overdue by 839 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 839 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 839 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window