AFGHAN ISLAMIC AND CULTURE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2025
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Nasser Nassib | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Yaqub Neda | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mustafa Huqoqi | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr SAFIA REJA | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Jalil khan | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Hafiz Scandari | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Afzal Daulatzai | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | 31/03/2025 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.04k | £123.62k | £184.58k | £238.41k | £206.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.27k | £141.48k | £178.13k | £177.33k | £112.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2025 | 24 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2025
(These accounts |
24 May 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 March 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 March 2023 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 July 2022 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 July 2022 | 170 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
I TO ADVANCE THE BASIC ISLAMIC TEACHINGS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE QURAN AND SUNNAH OF PROPHET MOHAMMAD (PBUH) TO THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY. II TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF THE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, EDUCATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE COMMUNITY, IN PARTICULAR THE AFGHAN MUSLIM COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
212-214 Church Road
London
NW10 9NP
- Phone:
- 02084596111
- Email:
- info@aiccmosque.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window