Accounts and annual returns MID CHESHIRE FOOTPATH SOCIETY

Charity Number: 513840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 25 April 2024 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 11 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required