HIKING 4 HEALTH

Charity Number: 1185686
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Organises a twice weekly series of casual walks throughout County Durham and beyond

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £9,572
Total expenditure: £5,032

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 October 2019: CIO registration
  • 07 October 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 07 October 2024: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • CONSETT HIKING GROUP (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £13.37k £9.57k
Total expenditure £11.98k £5.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.15k £7.59k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 October 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time