LYTCHETT MINSTER & UPTON BEACON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities & services to allow inhabitants to meet & take part in social interaction via clubs, activities & events such as drama, dance instruction, concerts, produce shows & others. Space will be offered for hire for private parties & functions. To act as an umbrella & source of help & advice for groups undertaking social & cultural activities (e.g Community Art Festival, Carnival)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
Governance
- 13 March 2019: CIO registration
- 28 September 2022: Funds received from 273191 LYTCHETT MINSTER AND UPTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
lynn wright MSc PGCE | Chair | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Waters BA hons | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Gabriele McTernan | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Ronald Burns M.Sc. | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD TAZEWELL BSC MA | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|||||
PENNY BROWN | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROL TILLING | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mabel Fraser | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 01/01/2023 | 29/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £7.06k | £67.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £7.04k | £49.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 06 December 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 06 December 2023 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 05 October 2021 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 05 October 2021 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND WELL-BEING AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF ENHANCING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 3.2 TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE COMMUNITY CENTRE AND ANY OTHER PROPERTIES IT HOLDS OR LEASES (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS; 3.3 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Upton Community Centre
Poole Road
Upton
Poole
Dorset
BH16 5HY
- Phone:
- 01202624622
- Email:
- lubca@uptonandlytchett.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window