Trustees LECKHAMPTON ROVERS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1182944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katie Blaney Trustee 30 April 2025
None on record
Alan Jeffrey Mercer Trustee 30 January 2025
None on record
Nico George Kontou Goymer Trustee 30 January 2025
None on record
Laura Lee Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Austin Packer Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Paul William Muncaster Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Gordon Hay Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
Jacqueline Russell Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
John Devlin Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
Simon Jackson Trustee 24 October 2020
None on record
Damien Peter McLoughlin Trustee 24 October 2020
None on record
Mark Beaney Trustee 08 March 2019
None on record
David Pitts Trustee 08 March 2019
None on record
Andrew Pitchford Trustee 08 March 2019
None on record