BLACK STAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We undertake a range of activities to achieve the objects of the organisation. This includes providing tools and resources to support education and personal development, sponsorship, mentoring and capacity building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Barbados
- Ghana
- Jamaica
- Nigeria
- South Africa
- The Gambia
Governance
- 25 November 2019: CIO registration
- Black Star Foundation (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jackie Ballard | Trustee | 08 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Niaomi Collett | Trustee | 08 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Hepburn | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN MCINTOSH | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Nov 2019 as amended on 20 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE ? 1)THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE OF AFRICAN, CARIBBEAN AND DUAL HERITAGE, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: A) PROVIDING A PERSONAL, SOCIAL, ACADEMIC, CAREER DEVELOPMENT AND MENTORING PROGRAMME SO AS TO INCREASE THEIR EMPLOYMENT PROSPECTS SO THAT THEY CAN FULFILL THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AND ACHIEVE THEIR CAREER AND LIFE AMBITIONS B) DEVELOPING PARTNERSHIPS AND COLLABORATIONS WITH BUSINESSES, NOT-FOR-PROFIT ORGANISATIONS AND CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE, WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE OF AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN HERITAGE IN ORDER TO ADDRESS THE PARTICULAR DISADVANTAGE THAT THEY FACE C) AWARDING SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIP, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, COLLEGE OR UNIVERSITY WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE D) PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE SCHOOL SECTOR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES AND EQUIPMENT FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOLS. E) CONDUCTING AND/OR PROMOTING RESEARCH UNDERTAKEN FOR THE PURPOSES OF TACKLING THE PARTICULAR DISADVANTAGE FACED BY YOUNG PEOPLE OF AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN HERITAGE AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH. 2) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PREVENT OR RELIEF POVERTY OF CHILDREN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE, BY PROVIDING ITEMS, GRANTS, AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
137 ST. JAMES'S CRESCENT
LONDON
SW9 7HX
- Phone:
- 07942 347 952
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window