NORTHAMPTON COMMUNITY SHEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a Community Shed we provide a place in Northampton where local people, particularly older or partially-disabled people, can learn, teach, and pursue practical interests and skills, for themselves and others. Here people can engage in charitable practical work at a relaxed and leisurely pace, in a safe, friendly, and inclusive environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 16 July 2019: CIO registration
- NORTHAMPTON COMMUNITY SHED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip James Osborne | Chair | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marina Arthur | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Julie Leadbetter | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Austin | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith John Westhead | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harsimran Singh Samrai | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Charles Thorndike | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | 01/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.56k | £2.76k | £3.17k | £9.46k | £7.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.77k | £1.23k | £5.21k | £9.92k | £7.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.88k | £1.63k | N/A | £2.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING ADULTS IN NORTHAMPTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET JOINTLY OR INDIVIDUALLY TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; SOCIAL ISOLATION, BEREAVEMENT, OLD AGE OR ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL).
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spencer Contact
Gladstone Close
NORTHAMPTON
NN5 7AY
- Phone:
- 07961062705
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window