HOVE SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hove Surf Life Saving Club operates from Hove Lagoon and provides lifesaving training in and around the water for children aged 8-16 years. Its aim is to educate with the view to benefiting the Brighton & Hove and local area community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
Governance
- 08 April 2019: CIO registration
- HSLSC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Davis | Chair | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Everington | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare Edes | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Walker | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.89k | £5.99k | £24.66k | £15.84k | £13.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.10k | £7.38k | £18.38k | £5.73k | £12.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE HOVE SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB IS ESTABLISHED IS TO SAVE LIVES AND PREVENT DROWNING AND TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO LIFESAVING, RESCUE AND RESUSCITATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN BRIGHTON & HOVE AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF SURF LIFESAVING QUALIFICATIONS AND TRAINING IN WATER SAFETY, RESCUE, LIFESAVING, COACHING, RESUSCITATION AND FIRST AID; THE PROMOTION AND ORGANISATION OF LIFESAVING AND RESCUE, BEACH AND POOL TRAINING, WATER SPORTS AND LIFESAVING ACTIVITIES FOR TRAINING, RECREATION AND ENJOYMENT THAT ENCOURAGE FITNESS, TEAM WORK, RESPONSIBILITY AND EXCELLENCE IN PURSUIT OF THESE OBJECTS; THE PROMOTION OF AND THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTARY LIFESAVING AND RESCUE SERVICES TO THE COMMUNITY AND PUBLIC AT LARGE; THE PROVISION OF LIFESAVING SAFETY AWARENESS AND PREVENTION OF DROWNING INFORMATION; THE PROMOTION OF THE CLUB AND ITS ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Hove Park Way
Hove
East Sussex
BN3 6PS
- Phone:
- 07786321695
- Email:
- kath.hslsc@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window