FORGET-ME-NOT BUDDIES (TAMESIDE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Forget-Me-Not Buddies is a group run by Carers and Volunteers that specifically offers subsidised social activities and interaction for persons living with Dementia and their Carers. It offers support from people who have walked the full path of the Dementia journey, from diagnosis to beyond demise of the diagnosed. The group is based in Tameside and accepts members from surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tameside
Governance
- 03 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vivian Anne Shilton | Chair | 03 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne McDonald | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carrol Ashton | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Walker | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roy William Bate | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.59k | £6.48k | £23.74k | £42.52k | £37.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.65k | £5.56k | £18.34k | £30.59k | £32.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS LIVING WITH DEMENTIA TOGETHER WITH THEIR CARERS LIVING IN TAMESIDE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING EDUCATION, TRAINING, INFORMATION AND ADVICE, SOCIAL EVENTS AND OUTINGS AT REGULAR SESSIONS, AND TO HAVE A RESOURCE OF ACTIVITIES WHICH PROVIDE STIMULATION FOR THOSE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA TO HELP IMPROVE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THEM AND THEIR CARERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61D LEICESTER ROAD
FAILSWORTH
MANCHESTER
M35 0GW
- Phone:
- 07525822874
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window