OPTIONS PREGNANCY RESOURCE CENTRE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of advice and assistance to women and their partners who are suffering from any physical or mental illness, distress or poverty as a result of pregnancy or following an abortion, miscarriage, cot death, still birth or loss of a child. The provision of a service to schools/colleges which encourages young people to make responsible and healthy choices regard to sexual behaviour.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 February 2020: CIO registration
- OPTIONS - THE WIMBLEDON PREGNANCY RESOURCE CENTRE (Working name)
- OPTIONS CIO (Working name)
- OPTIONS WIMBLEDON PREGNANCY RESOURCE CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Genevieve Susan Johnston | Chair | 20 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Chris Weir | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew John Nicholls | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Kathleen Chambers | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.82k | £52.64k | £42.78k | £57.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.09k | £39.07k | £41.49k | £39.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 March 2025 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 March 2025 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF WOMEN’S HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND ASSISTANCE TO WOMEN AND THEIR PARTNERS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS, DISTRESS OR POVERTY DURING OR AS A RESULT OF PREGNANCY OR FOLLOWING AN ABORTION, MISCARRIAGE, COT DEATH, STILL BIRTH OR LOSS OF A CHILD; AND (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF PREGNANCY AND THE TERMINATION OF PREGNANCY AND INTO THE EFFECTS THEREOF UPON WOMEN WHETHER PHYSICAL, MEDICAL OR PSYCHOLOGICAL BY THE PROVISION OF A SERVICE TO SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES THAT ENCOURAGES AND HELPS YOUNG PEOPLE TO MAKE RESPONSIBLE AND HEALTHY CHOICES WITH REGARD TO THEIR SEXUAL BEHAVIOUR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Options CIO
577 Kingston Road
LONDON
SW20 8SA
- Phone:
- 02085407675
- Email:
- info@optionslondon.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window