Financial history WAH SING CHINESE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 513857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £25.69k £29.50k £19.45k £30.09k £57.13k
Total expenditure £32.04k £20.10k £39.39k £43.09k £50.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A