SPOT PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SPOT PROJECT is a charity that advocates development of the new generation in Africa and around the world. Our aims revolve around meeting educational needs of the society and enriching individuals with the skills to enable them to prosper.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income:
£1,187,322
Donations and legacies | £1.18m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £4.04k |
Total expenditure:
£590,214
Raising funds | £60.39k | |
Charitable activities | £529.83k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £60.39k | |
Charitable expenditure | £529.83k | |
Retained for future use | £597.11k |
People

5 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- The Gambia
Governance
- 30 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bilal Abdul-Khaliq | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fatima Batrane | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shahima Khanum | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nurma Khanum | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £971.91k | £1.42m | £1.38m | £1.78m | £1.19m | |
|
Total expenditure | £243.32k | £889.50k | £1.01m | £1.82m | £590.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £971.91k | £1.41m | £1.38m | £1.78m | £1.18m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.04k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £228.50k | £788.25k | £672.17k | £1.28m | £529.83k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £14.83k | £101.26k | £204.37k | £253.26k | £60.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £67.91k | £37.26k | £0 | £15.84k | £14.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £10.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £128.47k | £287.82k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £7.28k | £8.28k | £27.17k | £18.85k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £728.58k | £1.26m | £1.64m | £1.57m | £2.19m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £0 | £5.00k | £10.00k | £13.86k | £29.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 14 October 2022 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 14 October 2022 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION INCLUDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN GAMBIA AND THE DEVELOPING WORLD. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN GAMBIA AND THE DEVELOPING WORLD. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN GAMBIA AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ENGLAND & WALES THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, GENDER, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spot Project
31a Scarborough Street
Aldgate
LONDON
E1 8DR
- Phone:
- 0204 503 7808
- Email:
- info@spotproject.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window