IM LIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help alleviate poverty whilst supporting human rights and diversity in Cameroon, Liberia, Madagascar and throughout England and Wales. We do this by raising funds from donations and charitable events and supporting like-minded England and Wales registered charities, providing advocacy/advice/information and providing direct support to those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cameroon
- Liberia
- Madagascar
Governance
- 05 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irene Malin | Chair | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Malin | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Peter Crawley | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN PATRICIA BUTTERFILL | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.02k | £250 | £60 | £155 | |
|
Total expenditure | £150 | £1.25k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 June 2024 | 223 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 June 2024 | 223 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2023 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 144 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 November 2020 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY THROUGH THE OF PROVISION OF FOOD, BASIC HYGIENE SUPPLIES, EDUCATION MATERIALS, TRAINING AND GUIDANCE AND OTHER SUPPORT WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA, AND ESPECIALLY IN CAMEROON, LIBERIA AND MADAGASCAR. IN ADDITION TO DIRECT ACTION, THIS OBJECT MAY ALSO BE ACHIEVED THROUGH SUPPORTING OTHER RELEVANT CHARITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
INGRESS ABBEY
PRIORESS CRESCENT
GREENHITHE
DA9 9UR
- Phone:
- 0208 638 6111
- Email:
- contact@imlife.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window