THAQWA MASJID AND MADRASAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Thaqwa is a multi-purpose English speaking institution which is located at the heart of the diverse communities of Birmingham and serves people of every walk of life. In addition to our community services, there are 313 students (adults/children and male and female) who are being taught by a staff of 19 dedicated people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 July 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUHAMMAD BADRUL HAQUE | Chair | 07 December 2018 |
|
|||||
MUHAMMAD MUBEEN | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
RAHIMA ISLAM | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
ABDUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Salek | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.63k | £91.47k | £93.26k | £71.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.51k | £89.24k | £92.30k | £67.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 March 2024 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 March 2024 | 138 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2023 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
“TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN BIRMINGHAM AND THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF PROVIDING: ·A PLACE OF WORSHIP ·RELIGIOUS EDUCATION ·PROVISION OF RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG PEOPLE IN AREAS AFFECTED BY DISASTERS OR BY CONFLICTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Birmingham Muslim Foundation
470 Green Lane
Small Heath
BIRMINGHAM
B9 5QJ
- Phone:
- 01217737525
- Email:
- info@bmf1.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window