Trustees FRIENDS OF DAVENPORT HOUSE
Charity Number: 1184307

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Martyn Speirs | Chair | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosalyn Chasler | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kingsley Roberts | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Mairi Hill | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Twelftree | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Watts Mair | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT FLETCHER | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Joan Averil Shopper | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.