THE DEREK MOORE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As Listed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guatemala
- India
- Kenya
- Mexico
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
Governance
- 05 August 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RENE JOHN SIVA | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Stephen Toms | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.14k | £17.30k | £48.43k | £32.71k | £5.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.22k | £39.19k | £29.00k | £35.82k | £1.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE ANY PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR OTHER NON PROFIT ORGANISATIONS OR INDIVIDUALS IN THE UK OR OVERSEAS AND IDENTIFIED BY THE TRUSTEES AT THEIR DISCRETION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pigwell Farm
Jurys Gap Road
Lydd
ROMNEY MARSH
Kent
TN29 9JN
- Phone:
- 07774151532
- Email:
- derekmoore355@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window