CECOS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the charity is mainly to make grants to relieve poverty, advance education and to preserve and protect good health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income:
£505,593
Donations and legacies | £505.59k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£132,689
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £131.19k | |
Other | £1.50k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.50k | |
Charitable expenditure | £131.19k | |
Retained for future use | £372.90k |
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 December 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUDASSIR TANVEER | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Aakif Tanveer | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jawad Tanveer | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.05k | £268.41k | £305.50k | £505.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.95k | £52.21k | £165.63k | £132.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £505.59k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £131.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £775.30k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 26 November 2024 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2023
(These accounts |
26 November 2024 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 19 October 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 19 October 2022 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 28 October 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 28 October 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 SEP 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, INPARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO MAKE GRANTS TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Floor 23 South Mall
St. Georges Chambers
Edmonton Green
London
United Kingdom
N9 0TS
- Phone:
- 02073593316
- Email:
- mudassir@cecos.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window