Financial history LONG EATON AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1182489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.25k £8.48k £2.76k £11.29k £8.81k
Total expenditure £29.45k £7.99k £6.10k £6.58k £9.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A