Financial history DAVID "BOMBER" PEARCE LEGACY

Charity number: 1182541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.84k £13.72k £19.67k £14.08k £14.51k
Total expenditure £12.22k £8.83k £14.91k £18.83k £17.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A