RISBY VILLAGE HALL CHARITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of the Village Halls, Recreation Ground, Playground and MUGA (Multi use Games Area) for the benefit of the Village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 06 November 2019: CIO registration
- 11 May 2020: Funds received from 1096335 RISBY VILLAGE HALL CHARITY TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vivien Lorraine South | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dean Richard Taylor | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Anne Taylor | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Craig Ellis | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Lucy Baines | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
DARREN JOHN MATTHEWS | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Alois Edwards | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.72k | £53.59k | £44.09k | £45.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.13k | £40.43k | £60.08k | £39.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.50k | £17.91k | £500 | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2020
(These accounts |
15 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
IN RISBY, SUFFOLK (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION OF THE VILLAGE HALL RECREATION AND PLAYGROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS AND FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Risby Village Hall
Aylmer Close
Risby
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP28 6RT
- Phone:
- 07835515710
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window