KING EDWARD VII SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust raises money for the education of the poor and needy and the improvement of their lives. The charity raises money from donors in the UK who wish to contribute to the improvement of children's lives by creating a better opportunity for them. See the objects for more.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- South Africa
Governance
- 15 August 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Perchtold | Chair | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Geoffrey Richard Jaspan | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||
James Spence Sealy Smyth | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £2.44k | £6.83k | £5.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £250 | £250 | £250 | £993 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 August 2023 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
THE MAIN OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: TO RECEIVE FUNDING FROM KING EDWARD VII HIGH SCHOOL ALUMNI BASED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OTHER THIRD PARTIES FOR THE PURPOSE OF ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF PUPILS ATTENDING, OR WHO HAVE ATTENDED, KING EDWARD VII SCHOOL BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 3.1. PROVIDING FUNDING FOR UNDER-PRIVILEGED, POOR OR NEEDY CHILDREN FROM AFRICAN COUNTRIES WHO ARE FINISHING PRIMARY SCHOOL (FINISHING GRADE 7) SUCH THAT THEY MAY ATTEND KING EDWARD VII SCHOOL. 3.2. TO PROVIDE FUNDING FOR KING EDWARD VII SCHOOL MATRICULANTS (A-LEVEL EQUIVALENT PUPILS) TO ATTEND ONE OF THE TOP 5 UNITED KINGDOM UNIVERSITIES, WHICH MUST BE RANKED AS SUCH BY AT LEAST 2 OF THE FOLLOWING RANKING PUBLISHERS, OR THEIR EQUIVALENT SUCCESSOR: THE COMPLETE UNIVERSITY GUIDE, THE GUARDIAN AND THE TIMES (OR THE SUNDAY TIMES). 3.3. TO PROVIDE FUNDING TO KING EDWARD EDUCATIONAL TRUST (KEET) IN SOUTH AFRICA PROVIDED AT THE TIME OF THIS FUNDING IT CONTINUES TO HAVE PUBLIC BENEFIT ORGANISATION STATUS (I.E. ÔCHARITABLE STATUSÖ) IN SOUTH AFRICA AND THE TRUSTEES AT THEIR DISCRETION DEEM KEET TO BE ACHIEVING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTIVES: 3.3.1. PROVIDING RELATED AND ASSOCIATED EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT COURSES IN RELATION TO EDUCATIONAL ENRICHMENT, ACADEMIC SUPPORT, SUPPLEMENTARY TUITION OR OUTREACH PROGRAMMES FOR THE POOR AND NEEDY, AND THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES AND AWARDS FOR STUDY, RESEARCH AND TEACHING; 3.3.2. ERECTING, OR CONTRIBUTING TO THE COST OF ERECTING, OF ANY BUILDING OR BUILDINGS FOR THE PURPOSES OF PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL ENRICHMENT, ACADEMIC SUPPORT, SUPPLEMENTARY TUITION OR OUTREACH PROGRAMMES FOR THE POOR AND NEEDY; 3.3.3. SUPPLEMENTING THE SALARY OF ANY EXISTING OR FUTURE TEACHER EMPLOYED BY KING EDWARD VII SCHOOL WHERE IT IS NECESSARY TO ENSURE EDUCATIONAL ENRICHMENT, ACADEMIC SUPPORT OR SUPPLEMENTARY TUITION FOR THE POOR AND NEEDY. NOTHING IN THIS DEED SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
M Perchtold - Omba Adv & Inv Ltd
Cargo Works, 1-2 Hatfields
LONDON
SE1 9PG
- Phone:
- 02031768400
- Email:
- kesukoldboys@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window