THE LETHERHEAD INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Institute building for the benefit of the local community in accordance with the wishes of the benefactor, Abraham Dixon, who presented the building (but provided no endowment) to the local community in 1892 for social, leisure and educational purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £62,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 August 2019: CIO registration
- 14 September 2020: Funds received from 1046688 THE LETHERHEAD INSTITUTE
- THE LEATHERHEAD INSTITUTE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL KENDALL HARRISON | Chair | 08 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
GRANT JOHN CLIFFORD | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN WILLIAM COLE | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MARTYN HICKEY | Trustee | 17 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
HILARY MARGARET PORTER | Trustee | 13 February 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.19k | £102.10k | £97.30k | £97.54k | £113.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.87k | £95.33k | £85.63k | £111.97k | £134.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £11.46k | £23.54k | N/A | £62.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 12 April 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF LEATHERHEAD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEATHERHEAD INSTITUTE TRUSTEES
LEATHERHEAD INSTITUTE
67 HIGH STREET
LEATHERHEAD
KT22 8AH
- Phone:
- 07748493376
- Email:
- trusteesins@tecres.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window