BLOC PROJECTS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education in the field of contemporary visual art by the establishment and maintenance of a gallery providing exhibitions of art, talks, workshops and events for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 12 March 2020: Standard registration
- BLOC PROJECTS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maud Haya-Baviera | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela YT Chan | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frank Lamb | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Holmes | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Friedli | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeanine Griffin | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Cheeseman | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Zillah Rose Butler | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.01k | £83.15k | £106.02k | £145.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.43k | £77.36k | £96.26k | £145.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £71.65k | £1.00k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 March 2025 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 March 2025 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 JUL 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF CONTEMPORARY VISUAL ART BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A GALLERY PROVIDING EXHIBITIONS OF ART, TALKS, WORKSHOPS AND EVENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLOC STUDIOS
4 SYLVESTER STREET
SHEFFIELD
S1 4RN
- Phone:
- 07515727181
- Email:
- info@blocprojects.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window