Trustees BLOC PROJECTS LTD
Charity number: 1188511

Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maud Haya-Baviera | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela YT Chan | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frank Lamb | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Holmes | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Friedli | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeanine Griffin | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Cheeseman | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Zillah Rose Butler | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.