HARRISON/PARROTT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The HarrisonParrott Foundation supports and champions diversity and inclusivity within the arts. We deliver/support programmes and projects which counter/correct the idea that ethnicity, gender, sexuality, disability and social background or life experience are impediments to full inclusivity. We believe everyone deserves to have access to, to be free to participate in and contribute to the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 December 2019: CIO registration
- 23 June 2020: Funds received from 800032 H/P INTERNATIONAL ARTS TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas William Northey | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Aizlewood | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Kaye Minton | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Peter Kuhles | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Connolly | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samir Savant | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JASPER WILLIAM PARROTT | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.34k | £29.23k | £33.53k | £37.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.25k | £18.81k | £30.97k | £31.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE MUSICAL ARTS AND ASSOCIATED ART FORMS BY PROVIDING FUNDING FOR, OR OTHERWISE PROMOTING AND/OR DELIVERING PROGRAMMES, COURSES OR EVENTS, ALONE OR IN COLLABORATION WITH OTHERS, WHICH PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES TO EXPERIENCE AND PARTICIPATE IN THE MUSICAL ARTS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE WHO WOULD NOT USUALLY HAVE ACCESS TO SUCH OPPORTUNITIES GIVEN THEIR ECONOMIC OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES; AND 3.2 TO PROMOTE EQUALITY, DIVERSITY AND INCLUSIVITY IN THE MUSICAL ARTS AND ASSOCIATED ARTS, BOTH AMATEUR AND PROFESSIONAL, AND TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PEOPLE FROM MINORITY ETHNIC BACKGROUNDS AND THOSE WHO WOULD NOT USUALLY HAVE ACCESS TO SUCH OPPORTUNITIES GIVEN THEIR ECONOMIC OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, TO EXPERIENCE OR PARTICIPATE IN THE MUSICAL ARTS AND ASSOCIATED ART FORMS AND ASSOCIATED BUSINESSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Wing
Somerset House
The Strand
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07552192718
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window