WEST AREA PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
West Area Project provides relief for people with learning disabilities and/or autism and their families or carers, who live in Nottingham city and its surrounding area by providing day and evening activities and support. This service is provided at a centre, in the community and occasionally in the member's home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £180,495 from 2 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 27 March 2019: CIO registration
- 08 February 2021: Funds received from 701055 WEST AREA PROJECT WORKING WITH ADULTS WITH LEARNIN...
- WEST AREA PROJECT WORKING WITH ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALFRED STIEGLER | Chair | 10 June 2009 |
|
|||||
Clare Lloyd | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Noyes | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rita Ann Beard | Trustee | 10 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL JAYS | Trustee | 10 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY HARRISON | Trustee | 10 June 2009 |
|
|
||||
FARRAH ATHAR | Trustee | 10 June 2009 |
|
|
||||
ANN STIEGLER | Trustee | 10 June 2009 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.02k | £112.31k | £161.22k | £162.48k | £199.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.90k | £102.38k | £166.13k | £170.71k | £204.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £65.02k | £102.71k | £148.52k | £139.77k | £180.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES AND/OR AUTISM AND THEIR FAMILIES OR CARERS, WHO LIVE IN NOTTINGHAM CITY AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Lenton Centre
Willoughby Street
Lenton
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 1RQ
- Phone:
- 01159056060
- Email:
- wapnottm@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window