BUCKLAND SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Buckland Support help people of any age who are patients of Buckland Surgery and all people who live on the Buckland Estate to improve their physical and mental health and well-being. We offer support and practical help with a huge range of issues as well as providing transport, form filling, and advocacy through our Social Enabler and volunteers who offer groups, befriending and practical help
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £1,665 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 16 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Whitbread B Sc CQSW | Chair | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Elizabeth Clarke | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Bradley | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Tompkins | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carole Bishop | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2021 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.24k | £12.53k | £37.62k | £41.44k | £39.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.39k | £21.87k | £35.41k | £41.43k | £39.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.88k | £4.00k | N/A | N/A | £1.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO FURTHER THE FOLLOWING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN NEWTON ABBOT IN GENERAL AND THE AREA OF BUCKLAND IN PARTICULAR: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH BY CO-OPERATING WITH BUCKLAND SURGERY AND OTHER HEALTH SERVICES TO PROVIDE SERVICES, ACTIVITIES AND INFORMATION WITH THE AIM OF PROTECTING AND PRESERVING GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH, PREVENTING DISEASE AND PROMOTING HEALTHY LIFESTYLES. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND THEIR PARENTS/CARERS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND PARENTING SKILLS TRAINING TO PARENTS/CARERS B) PROVIDING SAFE GROUP PLAY AND OTHER ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO SUPPORT CHILDREN’S SOCIAL AND EMOTIONAL DEVELOPMENT; C) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP AN INDIVIDUAL’S CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING; D) PROVIDING ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND THEIR PARENTS/CARERS; 3) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS DEEMED CHARITABLE WITHIN THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES, SERVICES OR FACILITIES DESIGNED TO RELIEVE THE EFFECTS OF SOCIAL ISOLATION. 4) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS WHO ARE ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED, PROVIDING A SIGNPOSTING SERVICE TO OTHER SOURCES OF ADVICE AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS AND WORKING CO-OPERATIVELY WITH OTHER CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS WHO WORK TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Buckland Surgery
1 Raleigh Road
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ12 4HG
- Phone:
- 07411573776
- Email:
- ymabry@nhs.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window