HAMAKOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing Judaism mainly but not exclusively by: 1. Providing retreats, contemplative groups, religious workshops, sacred spaces and services, seminars, meetings and sermons, 2. Contributing to followers' good mental and physical health and spiritual wellbeing, and 3. Promoting the study of religious teachings, scriptures, practices, meditation and mindfulness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roland Oliver Brandman | Chair | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Edward John Gold | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Emilia Freed | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sara Gina Bensusan | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.13k | £64.13k | £47.04k | £25.29k | £85.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.59k | £39.59k | £37.49k | £30.94k | £73.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 November 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 November 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE JEWISH RELIGION IN ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: - PROVIDING RETREATS, CONTEMPLATIVE GROUPS, RELIGIOUS WORKSHOPS, SACRED SPACES AND WORSHIP SERVICES, SEMINARS, MEETINGS, CONFERENCES, SERMONS AND PRAYER MEETINGS; - CONTRIBUTING TO FOLLOWERSÆ GOOD MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AND SPIRITUAL WELLBEING; AND PROMOTING THE STUDY OF RELIGIOUS TEACHINGS, SCRIPTURES, PRACTICES, MEDITATION AND MINDFULNESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
101A Theobald Street
BOREHAMWOOD
Hertfordshire
WD6 4PT
- Phone:
- 07552660260
- Email:
- zac@hamakom.community
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window