TRANSPORT AND HEALTH SCIENCE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Adding to collective knowledge on transport and health and educating and informing the public in general, scientists, social scientists, engineers, public health professionals, transport professionals and decision-makers in relation to the wide range of impacts transport and health have on each other. Key fields of concern include active travel, air pollution, climate change , transport safety etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

19 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Chile
- Costa Rica
- Cuba
- Germany
- Israel
- Malta
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 03 November 2020: CIO registration
- THSG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Stephen John Watkins | Chair | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Henry Hernandez Vega | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Silvia Shrubsall | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sandra Mandic | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ben Wooliscroft | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Daher | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dena Kasraian | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Hall | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAULA BARROS | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paulo Rui Anciaes | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Adamson | Trustee | 02 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Steven Yaffe | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Ellen Hoyle | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lake Sagaris | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JENNIFER SUSAN MINDELL | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adrian Lawrence Davis | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Charles Brian Alexander Musselwhite | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas James Fitzgerald | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Martin Rathfelder | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/08/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £406 | £561 | £393 | £873 | |
|
Total expenditure | £219 | £252 | £1.34k | £748 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 03 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 03 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 08 August 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 August 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ADDING TO COLLECTIVE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE SUBJECT OF TRANSPORT AND HEALTH. B) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY EDUCATING AND INFORMING THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, SCIENTISTS, SOCIAL SCIENTISTS, ENGINEERS, PUBLIC HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, TRANSPORT PROFESSIONALS AND DECISION-MAKERS IN RELATION TO THE WIDE RANGE OF IMPACTS TRANSPORT AND HEALTH HAVE ON EACH OTHER AND IN DOING SO SEEKING TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS WHICH POSITIVELY IMPACT ON HEALTH OR MINIMISE HARM TO HEALTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Faculty Of Public Health
4 St. Andrews Place
LONDON
NW1 4LB
- Phone:
- 07973660024
- Email:
- thsgchair@gmail.com
- Website:
-
transportandhealth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window