LAUGHTON J & I SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Laughton J&I School PTA is a registered charity which is run by trustees for the benefit of the children and where possible the wider community. Funds are generated predominately through activities/events organised by the trustees and volunteers from the community e.g. seasonal fayres, raffles, discos etc. We also source funding via commerce e.g. Community grants/awards
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 May 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Rotherham
Governance
- 13 May 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Troman | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Blakemore | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Gould | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Hinchcliffe | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Easton | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Blakemore | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jade Davidson | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Gould | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Spon-Smith | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Smith | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steven Smith BA Hons | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Rogers BA Hons | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicola McKinnie | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amy Smith | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/05/2020 | 08/05/2021 | 08/05/2022 | 08/05/2023 | 08/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.80k | £5.71k | £6.46k | £6.81k | £5.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.19k | £4.20k | £3.83k | £7.18k | £6.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 May 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 May 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 May 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 May 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 May 2020 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT LAUGHTON J & I SCHOOL BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES/EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND OFFER EXTENDED LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES TO THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Laughton Junior & Infant School
School Road
Laughton
SHEFFIELD
S25 1YP
- Phone:
- 01909550477
- Email:
- laughtonschoolpta@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window