PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF ASH TREES ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising events such as coffee mornings, fayres, raffles and grant applications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 06 June 1983: Standard registration
- PARENTS & FRIENDS OF ASHTREES SCHOOL (Working name)
- PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF ASH TREES SCHOOL (Previous name)
- WRENSFIELD PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathleen Bradley | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Robinson | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katy Smith | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Dargan | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Crabtree | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.45k | £1.80k | £3.68k | £2.31k | £21.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.09k | £9.65k | £1.23k | £1.49k | £10.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/04/1983 AS AMENDED ON 01/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 28 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROMOTING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ash Trees Academy
Bowes Road
BILLINGHAM
TS23 2BU
- Phone:
- 03339991451
- Email:
- ashtreespfa1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
ashtrees.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window