Trustees KENILWORTH UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1184403

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS GEORGE BOOKER | Chair | 29 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Brian William Stote | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Helen Mary Sutton | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANTHONY RATHBONE HARTLEY | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL STEPHEN WELLER | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
LEO VIVIAN LEWIS | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
HELEN PATRICIA ANNA HIGGINSON | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.