CHEW AND YEO BAPTIST NETWORK

Charity number: 1184270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Church services and other church activities including discussion groups, prayer groups. Community activities including toddler groups, monthly breakfasts,

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £68,015
Total expenditure: £81,112

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 July 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Nigel Robert Coles Trustee 28 March 2024
HOPE 08 LTD
Received: On time
Cordula Jane Ursula Hall Trustee 15 July 2019
None on record
ALAN JOHN PARKER Trustee 22 August 2018
WINFORD VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £64.30k £51.99k £83.10k £68.02k
Total expenditure £66.82k £61.06k £68.39k £81.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.00k £250 £250

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 November 2023 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 November 2023 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Chew Magna Baptist Church
Tunbridge Road
Chew Magna
Bristol
BS40 8SP
Phone:
01275331224