MILESHYCLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY ENCOURAGING PARTICIPATION IN SPORTS AND PHYSICAL ACTIVITIES WHICH IMPROVE FITNESS AND HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR IN THE SPORT OF RUNNING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £23,973 from 8 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bramwell Appleton | Chair | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Razia Shaikh-Patel | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Parveen Earl | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sasha Rudd | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Lyddon | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Collier | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.86k | £3.45k | £45.76k | £14.09k | £50.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.53k | £3.73k | £10.51k | £38.81k | £40.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.84k | £4.99k | N/A | £23.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY ENCOURAGING PARTICIPATION IN SPORTS AND PHYSICAL ACTIVITIES WHICH IMPROVE FITNESS AND HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR IN THE SPORT OF RUNNING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
#MileShyClub
Bartle House
9 Oxford Court
MANCHESTER
M2 3WQ
- Phone:
- 07403461240
- Email:
- hello@mileshyclub.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window