Financial history THE RED HEN PROJECT

Charity number: 1183845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £223.59k £232.24k £135.38k £337.03k
Total expenditure £0 £124.97k £208.44k £181.41k £250.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.22k £59.50k £11.67k £55.69k