THE AMOS BURSARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Amos Bursary promotes equality and diversity and advancement of education ( including social and career development training ) for the public benefit of young people of African and Caribbean heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£650,594
Donations and legacies | £639.40k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £11.20k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£596,562
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £526.64k | |
Other | £69.92k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £69.92k | |
Charitable expenditure | £526.64k | |
Retained for future use | £54.03k |
People

4 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
57 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Elizabeth Ebanja | Chair | 30 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colleen Althea Amos | Trustee | 30 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Butler | Trustee | 30 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Patricia Gill Clarke | Trustee | 30 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Hlakanyane Sipo Michael Zwambila | Trustee | 30 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.49m | £949.05k | £1.10m | £650.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.65k | £327.52k | £535.32k | £596.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.49m | £948.97k | £933.79k | £639.40k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £866 | £80 | £1.98k | £11.20k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £161.32k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £154.40k | £305.67k | £399.02k | £526.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £9.20k | £9.56k | £92.85k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £43.93k | £0 | £179.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.05k | £12.29k | £43.45k | £69.92k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.33m | £1.96m | £2.53m | £2.58m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £8.89k | £9.78k | £20.45k | £12.13k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND CAREER DEVELOPMENT TRAINING) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE OF AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN HERITAGE, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: (1) PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR THOSE FROM THE AGE OF 16 WHO ARE STATE EDUCATED AND WHO ARE ELIGIBLE FOR BRITISH HOME STUDENT STATUS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PROVIDING SUPPORT THROUGH EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES, AND PERSONAL AND PROFESSIONAL OPPORTUNITIES, DESIGNED TO EDUCATE SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE SO THAT THEY ARE ABLE TO OVERCOME THE DISADVANTAGE THEY GENERALLY FACE, WITH THE RESULTING EFFECT OF BUILDING THEIR CONFIDENCE AND RESILIENCE NECESSARY TO ENABLE THEM TO IMPROVE THEIR SELF-EFFICACY SO THAT THEY CAN FULFILL THEIR POTENTIAL AND ACHIEVE THEIR CAREER AND LIFE AMBITIONS, INCLUDING BY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): (A) DEVELOPING SKILLS IN NETWORKING AND PROVIDING ACCESS TO MENTORING AND INTERNSHIP SCHEMES; (B) WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH VOLUNTEERS AND SUPPORTERS TO DELIVER PROGRAMMES PROMOTING ACADEMIC AND PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH ACCESS TO, AND SUCCESSFUL PERFORMANCE AT, UNIVERSITY AND OTHER FORMS OF HIGHER EDUCATION, TO ENHANCE THE ABILITY TO THRIVE IN A COMPETITIVE WORLD; AND/OR (C) CREATING OPPORTUNITIES TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION AS A MEANS OF PREPARING THIS MINORITY GROUP OF YOUNG PEOPLE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE, OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT; AND/OR (2) DEVELOPING PARTNERSHIPS AND COLLABORATIONS WITH CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS AND NOT-FOR-PROFIT ORGANISATIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE, WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE OF AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN HERITAGE IN ORDER TO TACKLE THE PARTICULAR DISADVANTAGE THAT THEY FACE; AND/OR (3) PROMOTING RESEARCH UNDERTAKEN FOR THE PURPOSES OF TACKLING THE PARTICULAR DISADVANTAGE FACED BY YOUNG PEOPLE OF AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN HERITAGE AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH; AND/OR (4) PROVIDING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AND SERVICES FOR THE PURPOSES OF REDUCING THE STIGMATISATION OR DISCRIMINATION FACED BY YOUNG PEOPLE OF AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN HERITAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Tindale Close
SOUTH CROYDON
Surrey
CR2 0RT
- Phone:
- 07930549038
- Email:
- contact@amosbursary.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window