Friends of Redwood Academy Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising activities for the benefit of Pupils at the Academy
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 22 May 2019: Standard registration
- REDWOOD FRIENDS (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF REDWOOD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Butler | Chair | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Von De Heide | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Donna Marie Stenton | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 689 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 689 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1054 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1054 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1419 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1419 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 MAR 2019 as amended on 15 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Waddington Redwood Primary Academy
Redwood Drive
Waddington
LINCOLN
LN5 9BN
- Phone:
- 01522721156
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window