FRUGAL EMPOWERMENT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Frugal Foundation is building on community work in Greenwich, our project is centred on supporting young people to develop their musical talents, low income families. Supporting Elderly the through entertainment to ease or relief them from a state of loneliness, isolation etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Greenwich
Governance
- 23 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PEISENSIGIERE TZAVELAKOU | Chair | 09 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tubosun Philip Ogungbamigbe | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chinedum Bill Akas | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.46k | £87.98k | £151.81k | £153.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.36k | £54.26k | £83.58k | £90.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 10 January 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 10 January 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 06 January 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 06 January 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, BUT PARTICULARLY IN THE UK, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, BUT PARTICULARLY IN NIGERIA, BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4th Floor
18 St. Cross Street
London
EC1N 8UN
- Phone:
- 02083160704
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window