Accounts and annual returns OSTEOGENESIS IMPERFECTA FOUNDATION NETWORK

Charity number: 1190022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 10 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 10 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 November 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 November 2023 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 April 2022 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 April 2022 177 days late Download Open in new window