POSITIVE DESTINY FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Health promotion within vulnerable communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- South Africa
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 16 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Florence Maponga | Chair | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chelsea Jonathan | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kundayi Zahwe | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2023 | 199 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 921 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2023 | 564 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1286 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY HELPING TO PREVENT THE SPREAD OF THE HIV INFECTION IN PARTS OF SOUTHERN AFRICA, AND THE UK AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE BY PROVIDING SUCH GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE IN FURTHERING THE PURPOSE AND BY PROMOTING HIV/AID TESTING AND BY ORGANISING WORKSHOPS AND PROMOTION ACTIVITIES TARGETING COMMUNITIES AND INDIVIDUAL THOSE AT RISK. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 KINGFISHER DRIVE
RICHMOND
TW10 7UD
- Phone:
- 07796035700
- Email:
- INFO@CENTRE4SOCIALIMPACT.ORG
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window