NATIONAL EMERGENCIES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The National Emergencies Trust has been set up to raise funds from the general public in the event of a disaster or emergency within the United Kingdom for the alleviation of the needs of those affected by the event. The funds collected will be distributed by local partners on the ground in the areas affected by the emergency event. The Trust was launched in November 2019.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Isle Of Man
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BARRADELL OBE | Chair | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Davison | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jes Lavda | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Smith | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Clark | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Benjamin John Griffiths | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dalton Leong | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|||||
THELMA STOBER | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
GERALD ERNEST OPPENHEIM | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew Ian Beeforth OBE | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.11m | £89.72m | £2.40m | £572.97k | £481.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.17m | £93.38m | £3.34m | £1.43m | £772.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £130.00k | £19.86m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £336.50k | £2.01m | £377.11k | £452.42k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £9.78m | £87.70m | £2.02m | £79.45k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £11.24k | £258 | £41.10k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £16.00k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.16m | £93.15m | £3.27m | £1.36m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £8.52k | £224.14k | £66.20k | £64.71k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £58.68k | £53.75k | £44.89k | £34.06k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.65m | £90.42m | £2.54m | £575.78k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:TO RELIEVE AND TO ENABLE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OR DISABILITY, WHETHER PHYSICAL OR MENTAL, OF THE VICTIMS OF EMERGENCY INCIDENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS; TO RELIEVE AND TO ENABLE THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF EMERGENCY INCIDENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS; AND TO SUPPORT SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE AND WHICH ARE ADDITIONAL TO EXISTING NATIONAL AND LOCAL VOLUNTARY SECTOR CAPACITY:(A)RELATING TO EMERGENCY INCIDENTS;(B)FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE VICTIMS OF EMERGENCY INCIDENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS;(C)RELATING TO THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF PEOPLE INHABITING AN AREA AFFECTED BY AN EMERGENCY INCIDENT WHOSE LIVELIHOODS, SECURITY OR HEALTH ARE AT RISK; AND/OR (D)OTHERWISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN AN AREA AFFECTED BY AN EMERGENCY INCIDENT, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY SUPPORTING CHARITIES AND OTHER VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IN SUCH AN AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONDON SCOTTISH HOUSE
95 HORSEFERRY ROAD
LONDON
SW1P 2DX
- Phone:
- 000000000000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window