TEESSIDE FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of women in all areas including local, national and international issues of political and social importance, music, drama, other cultural subjects, all branches of agriculture, crafts, home economics, science, health, social welfare, to promote sustainable development, to advance citizenship for the public benefit by the promotion of civic responsibility and volunteering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- CLEVELAND FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pat Bolton | Chair | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Diane Patton | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina Mary Phillips | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Falla | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Neal | Trustee | 09 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANN BROWN | Trustee | 16 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
LYNN MITCHELL | Trustee | 16 April 2014 |
|
|||||
TINA MARIE RICHARDSON | Trustee | 18 October 2003 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.46k | £17.36k | £38.89k | £59.20k | £58.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.09k | £18.66k | £34.98k | £53.08k | £52.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.45k | £4.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED) AS AMENDED 29 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FEDERATION ARE TO FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN’S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION IN TEESIDE AND ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
REDCAR AND CLEVELAND, STOCKTON-ON-TEES, HARTLEPOOL AND MIDDLESBROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 24
The Cadcam Business Centre
High Force Road
Riverside Industrial Estate
Middlesb
- Phone:
- 01642219665
- Email:
- teesfedwi@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window